Woodham v. Moody et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Woodham
Defendant: Aaron Moody and Shawn Stephens
Case Number: 1:2019cv00068
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Shawn Stephens served on 8/22/2019. (fjg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Aaron Moody served on 8/22/2019. (fjg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Aaron Moody, Shawn Stephens.(Hollowell, Melissa)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Kaye Hollowell on behalf of Aaron Moody, Shawn Stephens (Hollowell, Melissa)
August 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Aaron Moody and Shawn Stephens and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, #2 Complaint, and a copy of this Order on each without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/5/2019. (ljb)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Sharp County Detention Center. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/5/2019. (ljb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Trevor Woodham. (llg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Trevor Woodham. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodham v. Moody et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Woodham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Moody
Represented By: Melissa Kaye Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Stephens
Represented By: Melissa Kaye Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?