Moffitt et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Emily Butler, Martin Davis, Marsha Moffitt and Dennis Bradford
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00072
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Strabala, Richard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steadman, Timothy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/8/2019. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 9/25/2019. (slb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Strabala, Richard)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Strabala, Richard)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #8 & #9 , granted. Mr. Peter W. Herzog, III and Mr. Jeremy A. Moseley are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/11/2019. (slb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jeremy A. Moseley. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3534024. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strabala, Richard)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Peter W. Herzog III. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3534007. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strabala, Richard)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #6 , granted as modified. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 30 September 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/27/2019.(crw)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Initial Responsive Pleading by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Strabala, Richard)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (incomplete image file.) The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry #2 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT." (thd)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (kdr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (kdr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Marsha Moffitt, Martin Davis, Emily Butler and Dennis Bradford.(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct and docket text modified to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Independence County Circuit Court, Case Number 32CV-19-161. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt number LIT073557. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moffitt et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Shane Strabala
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Peter W. Herzog, III
Represented By: Jeremy A. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Butler
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Davis
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Moffitt
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Bradford
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?