Pipkin v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Christopher Pipkin
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00097
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Julia C. Barrett re 10 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey S. Cashdan; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Matthew Brigman; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary A. McEntyre; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julia C. Barrett. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/01/2019. (rmg)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Julia C. Barrett. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570226. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Zachary A. McEntyre. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570221. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by J. Matthew Brigman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570213. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey S. Cashdan. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570207. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Talley, Graham)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/23/19. (ejy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Talley, Graham)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steadman, Timothy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Talley, Graham)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Graham Caughman Talley on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (jbh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (jbh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (jbh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, filed by Christopher Pipkin. (jbh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company from Cleburne County Circuit Court, case number 12cv19-175. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT074134. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pipkin v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Represented By: Graham Caughman Talley
Represented By: Julia C Barrett
Represented By: Jeffrey S Cashdan
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: J Matthew Brigman
Represented By: Zachary A McEntyre
Represented By: Julia C. Barrett
Represented By: J. Matthew Brigman
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pipkin
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?