Robinson v. Crown Equipment Corp

Plaintiff: Jason Robinson
Defendant: Crown Equipment Corporation
Case Number: 2:2002cv00084
Filed: June 13, 2002
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2009 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/13/09. (bkp)
March 12, 2009 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion in Limine as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/12/09. (bkp)
March 10, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel re closings and time limits. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/10/09. (bkp)
March 4, 2009 176 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel re availability of lawyers and directing counsel to meet and confer forthwith re any motions in limine, etc.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/4/09. (bkp)
February 9, 2009 163 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER notifying counsel that this case will start on Tuesday, March 17, 2009 and must go to the jury at or before Wednesday, March 25, 2009; if counsel cannot come to agreement regarding division of time between the two cases, they are directed to submit letter briefs by noon on Tuesday, February 17, 2009, in order for the Court to divide the time. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/9/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Crown Equipment Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Robinson
Represented By: Vicki L. Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J. Cullen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?