Hunt v. Smith, et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hunt
Defendant: Ovell Scott and Crystal Greer
Movant: Elton A Rieves, III
Case Number: 2:2003cv00194
Filed: July 17, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER denying 369 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/18/09. (bkp)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER denying 359 361 Motions for New Trial; denying 364 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/5/09. (mkf)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 356 JUDGMENT in favor of Ovell Scott against Kenneth Hunt re 353 Jury Verdict; dismissing separate deft Crystal Greer without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute; and dismissing the case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/23/09. (bkp)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge William R. Wilson, Jr: Pretrial w/parties; 13 jurors selected; Court conducts voir dire; 7 jurors selected and sworn; Court gives opening instructions; parties make opening statements; pltf begins eviden ce; pltf rests; motions for directed verdict denied; deft rests; renewed motions for directed verdict denied; Court gives closing instructions; parties make closing arguments; Bailiff sworn; Jury begins deliberations; Jury returns w/verdict in favor of deft; jury released; motion for sanctions moot; Judgment to be entered. (Court Exhibits A-D attached; Pltf Exhibit 4 ret'd to Pltf) (K. Hunt, Pro-se; K. Wren, deft) (Court Reporter J. Ammons) (maj)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting 345 Motion to Dismiss separate deft Richard Richardson. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/17/09. (bkp)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER denying 340 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/22/09. (bkp)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER denying 336 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/31/09. (bkp)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER denying 332 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/17/09. (bkp)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER denying 329 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/26/08. (mkf)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER denying 250 Motion to Abstain; denying as moot 252 Motion to Substitute Document; denying 253 Motion to Correct the Record; however, the Clerk is directed to make sure the docket numbers in the hard-file accurately reflect the docket numbers on CM-ECF--specifically Doc. Nos. 82 and 83. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/6/08. (mkf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Smith, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovell Scott
Represented By: Matthew Keith Wren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Elton A Rieves, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?