Jefferson, et al v. Helena-W Helena Sch, et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv00170
Filed: September 20, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion for Attorney Fees to plaintiffs in the sum of $8,500.00. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/14/09. (bkp)
March 25, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs for the amounts set forth in this Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/25/09. (bkp)
January 29, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a Clerk's Default as to Adolphus Hicks pursuant to 33 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/29/09. (mkf)
November 13, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER dismissing with prejudice all claims of plaintiffs against the District, Willie Easter, Clifton Walker, Walter Darnell, Jessie Smith, Rayne Gordon, Lionell Moss, Larry Wilson, and Raymond Simes; pltfs' claims against Adolphus Hicks remain before the court. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/13/08. (mkf)
September 11, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Adolphus Hicks. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/11/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson, et al v. Helena-W Helena Sch, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?