Vance v. Young et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv00316
Filed: December 8, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion to Clarify Order dated December 23, 2008; Prejudgment interest is awarded in the amount of $4410.90. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/6/09. (mkf)
December 17, 2008 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion for Attorney Fees; Pltf, as the prevailing party, is awarded a total of $30,861.55 in attorney fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/17/08. (mkf)
December 10, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 62 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Emanual Vance. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/10/08. (mkf)
September 26, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Emanual Vance against Brinkley Public Schools, Randolph Cannon, Randy Byrd re 55 Jury Verdict in the amount of $120,492.75 together with interest from the date of judgment until paid at the rate of 1.69% per annum. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/26/08. (bkp) Modified on 12/23/2008 pursuant to 76 Order Plaintiff is also awarded front pay in the amount of $16,000.00.(jct).
September 15, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Richard Young is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/15/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?