Moore v. Jackson et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00102
Filed: April 7, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Robert E Jackson, Jr against William Christopher Moore re 92 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/27/09. (bkp)
January 23, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to remove exhibits associated with docket entry #83 from CM/ECF and replace them with the redacted versions of Exhibit A through E. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/23/09. (bkp)
April 14, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that claims against defendant Tobar be dismissed with prejudice, and that case proceed against defendant Jackson only; Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2006. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/14/06. (bkp) (Modified entry on 4/17/2006 to correct text - incorrect event entered) (bfw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?