Boyles v. Hobbs et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00176
Filed: August 15, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of deft Scudamore against David Wayne Boyles re 107 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/11/09. (bkp)
February 18, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the claims against deft Scudamore be dismissed without prejudice and pltf's complts be dismissed 2 . Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/18/2009. (lej)
February 6, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 98 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; the claims against Defendant Shaconda Brown are DISMISSED, and she is dismissed as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/6/09. (mkf)
November 26, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 93 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 88 Motion for Summary Judgment of separate Defendants Banks, Hobbs, Mobley, and Harmon, and the claims against them are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/26/08. (mkf)
September 2, 2008 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to enter default against Defendant Brown; Defendant Brown is directed to respond to 79 Motion for Default Judgment within fifteen days of the date of this Order; the Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to Defendant Brown at the address indicated on the Marshal's return of service (Doc. No. 29). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/2/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyles v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?