Gammon v. Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department et al

Plaintiff: Willie Gammon
Defendant: Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department, Arkansas Highway Police, Dan Flowers and Ron Burks
Case Number: 2:2007cv00148
Filed: November 29, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ; case is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/8/09. (mkf)
April 20, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Counsel re 45 Response to and 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Defts may file a reply briefing the issue outlined in this letter by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, April 24, 2009; plaintiff should respond by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, May 1, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/20/09. (bkp)
March 9, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 defts' Second Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/9/09. (bkp)
March 2, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 29 Second MOTION to Dismiss directing plaintiff to respond by noon on Friday, March 6, 2009, if he disagrees with defts' position. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/2/09. (bkp)
October 10, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Compel; granting 22 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/10/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gammon v. Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Gammon
Represented By: Jimmie L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Highway Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?