Scott v. Helena Regional Medical Center

Plaintiff: Ruby Scott
Defendant: Helena Regional Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2008cv00020
Filed: February 12, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 42 Bill of Costs filed by Helena Regional Medical Center; the Court disallows costs for Fuller in the amount of $1,507.90; accordingly, costs are taxed against plaintiff in the amount of $1,022.71 and included in the judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/8/09. (mkf)
April 10, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Helena Regional Medical Center against Ruby Scott and dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/10/09. (bkp)
April 1, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 31 Motion to supplement. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/1/09. (bkp)
March 30, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing electronic equipment in the courthouse pursuant to General Order No. 54. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Helena Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Scott
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?