Willard v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Joseph M Willard
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Eddie Sensat, Randy Watson and Dennis Wilson
Case Number: 2:2008cv00024
Filed: February 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: John F. Forster
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 145 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/12/09. (bkp)
July 23, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice, and the requested relief be denied 2 17 . Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/23/2009. (lej)
April 16, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling 113 Objection filed by Joseph M Willard and denying his appeal. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/16/09. (bkp)
January 26, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion to Continue; a new hearing date will be scheduled by separate Order; denying 70 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; denying 74 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part 78 Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories as to interrogatories 1-2, 5-7, and 9-14. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/26/09. (mkf)
January 23, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 60 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, filed by Joseph M Willard; Pltf's appeal is DENIED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/23/09. (mkf)
January 21, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Motion to Seal Document re 63 Response (Non Motion); the Clerk is directed to remove Exhibit #1 from docket entry #63 from CM/ECF and place same under seal nunc pro tunc. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/21/09. (mkf)
January 13, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 67 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/13/09. (mkf) (docket text modified on 1/15/2009 to correct name of Judge that signed Order) (bfw).
January 5, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Adopting 56 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/5/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willard v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Sensat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?