Long v. Gay et al

Plaintiff: Michael E Long, Jr
Defendant: William Gay, Clemmons, Kathy Purdue, Greg Harmon and Edwards
Case Number: 2:2008cv00032
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 173 Jury Verdict in favor of defts William Gay and Faron Clemmons and against plaintiff. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice with plaintiff taking nothing. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/23/11. (kpr)
March 21, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 167 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/21/11. (kpr)
March 17, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 164 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defts. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/17/11. (kpr)
November 9, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 116 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 106 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cathy Perdew and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Perdew without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/9/09. (bkp)
September 21, 2008 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 93 granting 59 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Peter Edwards. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/21/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Gay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Purdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?