Ashwood Janitorial Services et al v. W W Contractors Inc et al

Plaintiff: Ashwood Janitorial Services, Carolyn Ashwood and Nathan Ashwood
Defendant: General Services Administration, Jeffery Sorensen, W W Contractors Inc, Matthew Friesser and Camron Doss
Case Number: 2:2008cv00038
Filed: March 26, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ordered and adjudged in accordance with the jury verdict, as well as this Court's determination, that the Plaintiffs take nothing on their complaint and the matter is dismissed with prejudice. All parties are to bear their respective costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 4/17/09. (hph)
April 16, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 4/16/09. (bkp)
January 9, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Amend; denying 43 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying 45 Motion for Reconsideration, granting 51 Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Judgment entered on November 7, 2008 re 40 Order awarding judgment to General Services Administration on its counterclaim against Ashwood Janitorial Services in the amount of $3,990, with interest at the rate of 1.44% per annnum. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 1/9/09. (mkf)
November 7, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Matthew Freiser, Jeffrey Sorenson, Camron Doss, and GSA; dismissing the claims against these defendants with prejudice; denying Motion for Summary Judgment filed by WW Contractors; granti ng Counter-claimants Camron Doss and GSA's Motion for Summary Judgment; entering judgment in the amount of $3,990 with interest at the rate of 1.44% per annum. The case remains set for jury trial on 4/13/2009 on the unresolved issues. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 11/7/2008. (Terminating 19 and 28 Motions) (thd) Modified on 1/9/2009 to reflect Judgment has been partially VACATED pursuant to 52 Order (mkf).
September 17, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs have 10 days from the date of this order to respond to 18 Defendants' Counterclaim or a default will be issued. Plaintiffs also have 10 days from the date of this order to respond to Counterclaimants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 9/17/2008. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashwood Janitorial Services et al v. W W Contractors Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration
Represented By: E. Fletcher Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Sorensen
Represented By: Junius Bracy Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W W Contractors Inc
Represented By: Junius Bracy Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Friesser
Represented By: Junius Bracy Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camron Doss
Represented By: E. Fletcher Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashwood Janitorial Services
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Ashwood
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Ashwood
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?