McCall v. Clay et al

Plaintiff: Bondary McCall
Defendant: Angela Clay, Melissa Wallace, Sherry McCoy and Does
Case Number: 2:2008cv00076
Filed: April 30, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk not to file documents received from Bondary McCall and to return those documents to him, and not to accept future documents from him. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/09. (bkp)
November 17, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 29 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, Pltf's case is hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute; any pending motions are denied as moot 8 32 ; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/17/08. (vjt)
October 29, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that Pltf's 2 Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute the action diligently and failure to respond to the Court's Order; any pending motions be DENIED AS MOOT; the Court certify that an ifp appeal from any Order and Judgment adopting this recommendation would not be taken in good faith; Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/29/08. (vjt)
October 3, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/3/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Clay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bondary McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?