Kennedy v. Green et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Kennedy
Defendant: Charlotte Green and Mark Harmon
Case Number: 2:2008cv00115
Filed: June 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 111 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2) and for failure to respond to the Court's Order; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/16/09. (vjt)
August 25, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with LR 5.5(c)(2) and for failure to respond to the Court's order 2 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/25/2009. (lej)
January 27, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendant Kundert in care of counsel for the prison's medical contractor; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint (DE#2), amended complaint (DE#63), this order, and summons, upon Defendant Kundert, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/27/09. (mkf)
January 15, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing deft Charlotte Green to file her response to 64 MOTION to Compel filed by Jeremy Kennedy no later than 11 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/15/09. (bkp)
October 20, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Copies; denying 46 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/20/08. (bkp)
September 12, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 23 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; and, denying 11 Defendant Greg Harmon's Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/12/2008. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?