Fudge v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: James C Fudge
Defendant: Moses Jackson, Brenda Parker, Willie Jamison, Patrick V Walton, Steven Decoursey and David Maney
Case Number: 2:2008cv00116
Filed: June 10, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 63 Jury Verdict, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Moses Jackson dismissing the complaint of James C Fudge with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/15/10. (vjt)
April 8, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of plaintiff James C. Fudge, ADC #078875, at the jury trial set to begin at 9:15 a.m. on Wednesday, April 14, 2010, before Judge J. Leon Holmes, in Courtroom 4-D, Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 W. Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, AR, and to send with plaintiff his complete institutional and medical files. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/8/10. (bkp)
April 5, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 53 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Defts' 43 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED; Pltf's claims against Deft Parker are dismissed without prejudice, the claims against Defts Jamison, DeCoursey, Maney, and Walton are dismissed with prejudice, and the claims for money damages against Deft Jackson in his official capacity are also dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/5/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fudge v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Fudge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick V Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Decoursey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Maney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?