Hester v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Westley Hester
Defendant: Larry Norris, M Hurd, Outlaw, C Harmon, Weekly, Does, Green, Wendy Kelley, Ray Hobbs, James Gibson and Kirksey
Case Number: 2:2008cv00123
Filed: June 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, without prejudice, 120 Application for Writ of Garnishment filed by Wesley Hester. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/27/11. (kpr)
September 15, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion for Issuance of Writ; directing the Clerk to prepare the Writ of Execution, prepare and attach the required Notice to deft of her right to claim certain property as exempt, and deliver the Writ to the Marshal for execution. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/15/10. (bkp)
July 16, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to complete the Writ of Execution form and prepare and attach the required Notice to Defendant of her right to claim certain property as exempt; and to deliver the writ to the Marshal for service. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/16/09. (bkp)
May 8, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 99 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, Pltf is awarded $360 against Deft Brenda Kirksey only, on Pltf's claim that she failed to protect him from another inmate's assault and for Pltf's filing fees; granting in part and denying in part Pltf's 103 Motion for attorney and filing fees; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/8/09. (vjt)
April 28, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf be awarded $10.00 against deft Kirksey only, on his claim that she failed to protect him from another inmate's assault 2 . Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/28/2009. (lej)
January 22, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 85 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting plaintiff's motion for default and directing the Clerk to enter deft Brenda Kirksey's default; Kirksey is directed to respond no later than 15 days after the entry of this order to plaintiff's request for the entry of a default judgment against her; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this order to deft Kirksey at the address indicated on the Marshal's return of serve. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/22/09. (bkp)
January 5, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 80 Partial Report and Recommendations, and denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment and 53 Motion to Compel filed by Wesley Hester; considering the Objection filed on 12/29/08 to be a motion for default judgment and referring it to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/5/09. (bkp)
December 12, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 73 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's claims against defts Hobbs, Gibson, Norris, Hurd, Outlaw, Harmon, Weekley and Kelley and to remove their names, as well as the Does, as party defts; dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claims against deft Charlotte Green; denying motion to amend 19 and denying as moot motions to stay discovery and to supplement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/12/08. (bkp)
October 20, 2008 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to return documents to plaintiff without filing them, and directing plaintiff to resubmit any that he considers relevant, along with an explanation of the relevance of each document he resubmits. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/20/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hester v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westley Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirksey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?