Williams v. Outlaw et al

Plaintiff: Thelma Williams, Jr
Defendant: Outlaw, Deekley and Curtis Rolfe
Case Number: 2:2008cv00131
Filed: July 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing plaintiff to testify at the court trial scheduled for Monday, February 2, 2009, and directing defts to ensure his attendance at the trial and to bring plaintiff's institutional and medical jackets 42 . Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/16/09. (bkp)
October 29, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 45 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 21 Motion for TRO filed by Thelma Williams, Jr. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/29/08. (bkp)
September 26, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 11 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS up to and including October 8, 2008; and granting 28 Motion for Reconsideration re 11 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Thelma Williams, Jr. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/26/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Outlaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deekley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Rolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?