Johnson v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Carroll Johnson
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Correctional Medical Services, Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, Greg Harmon, Teresa Kundert, West, Joe S Hughes and Charlotte Green
Case Number: 2:2008cv00153
Filed: August 6, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defts Wendy Kelley, Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs and Greg Harmon re 92 Order Adopting Partial Report and Recommendations; and denying the motion for summary judgment filed by plaintiff and dismissing all defts with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/16/09. (bkp)
September 24, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 89 Stipulation of Dismissal dismissing plaintiff's sclaims against defts CMS, Inc., Dr. Joe Hughes, Charlotte Green, Teresa Kundert and Debra Charlene West with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/24/09. (bkp)
November 17, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Partial Report and Recommendation 19 and denying 24 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/17/08. (bkp)
October 31, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Partial Report and Recommendation 25 and denying 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/31/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Kundert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe S Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?