Davis v. Harmon et al

Plaintiff: LaToyin Davis
Defendant: G Harmon, Clark and Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 2:2008cv00171
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2010 161 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Correctional Medical Services Inc, Richard Clark against LaToyin Davis re 159 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and certifying that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
January 15, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the motion for summary judgment filed by defts Richard Clark and CMS, Inc. be granted, and pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice 134 . Pltf's motion for summary judgment be denied 140 . The Court certi fy that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/15/2010. (lej)
May 14, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 55 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 43 Motion for TRO and 49 Motion for Relief filed by LaToyin Davis. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/14/09. (bkp)
April 8, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 Declaration filed by LaToyin Davis granting plaintiff's pro se motion for extension of time to respond to Proposed Partial Findings and Recommendations and directing plaintiff to file any objections to the pending Proposed Findings by 5:00 p.m., Wednesday, April 29, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/8/09. (bkp)
February 10, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Greg Harmon and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Harmon without prejudice and removing his name as a party defendant. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/10/09. (bkp)
January 16, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft Richard Clark, to reissue summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons and complaint on the deft Richard Clark at the address provided without prepayment o f fees or costs therefor, with the U.S. Marshal to send plaintiff's copy of process to the Clerk of the Court, who shall then remove the address prior to forwarding a copy to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/16/09. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 1/20/2009 to correct the Judge who signed the Order.)(thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Harmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaToyin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?