Sills v. Edwards et al

Plaintiff: Leonard A Sills
Defendant: Wendy Kelley and Edwards
Case Number: 2:2008cv00198
Filed: November 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 33 Order on Report and Recommendations ; case is dismissed with prejudice; the Court certifies, under 28 USC 1915(a)(3), that an ifp appeal taken from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/6/09. (mkf)
July 20, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that plaintiff's complaint and amended complaint be dismissed with prejudice; that this dismissal count as a "strike," and that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action would be frivolous and not taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/20/09. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 7/21/2009 to correct the filing event and the description of the document filed.) (thd).
April 7, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file an amended complaint within thirty days of the entry of this Order and directing the Clerk to send to plaintiff an ifp application, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/7/09. (bkp)
January 27, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, Pltf's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Order 5 of December 8, 2008; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/27/09. (vjt)
January 9, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the District Court dismiss the 1 Complaint without prejudice, under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), for failure to comply with the 5 Court's Order of 12/8/08. Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/9/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sills v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard A Sills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?