S & S Sales Inc v. Pancho's Mexican Foods Inc et al

Plaintiff: S & S Sales Inc
Defendant: Pancho's Mexican Foods Inc and Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc
Case Number: 2:2008cv00220
Filed: December 31, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/13/10. (bkp)
March 19, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER addressing trial issues. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/19/10. (bkp)
March 16, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Exclude; denying 62 Motion in Limine; denying 64 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion in Limine and directing AWG to disclose to the court within 36 hours from receipt of this Order why four witnesses were not identified before the discovery ddl. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/16/10. (bkp)
March 3, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendants' 17 32 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/3/10. (bkp)
March 2, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel re advice of counsel directing counsel to provide the court with citations by 5:00 p.m., Thursday, March 4, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/2/10. (bkp)
March 1, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Patrick J. Goss re motion to exclude defenses counsel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/1/10. (bkp)
February 23, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on defts' document production and other matters discussed in the February 18, 2010 telephone conference. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/23/10. (bkp)
February 18, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing Mr. Wilcox to prepare a precedent for an Order based upon the Court's rulings in the telephone conference and submit it to the Court and opposing counsel by noon, February 22, 2010; granting 38 Motion to Exclude; denying 39 Motion to Strike; and directing defendants to respond to plaintiff's 45 MOTION to Exclude Defense Counsel, or Alternatively, to Disqualify by Friday, February 26, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/18/10. (bkp)
February 9, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER directing attorneys Wellford and Goss to reply to the Court's inquiry as to testimony of potential witnesses; reply due by noon, Tuesday, February 16, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/9/10. (mkf)
November 4, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based on the telephone conference of today setting ddls as follows: Plaintiff's affidavit of a corporate representative to Pancho's no later than 4 p.m., Friday, November 6, 2009; Pancho's is directed to provide plaintiff with an affidavit concerning its inability to locate contact info for Larry Steward and Joe Hinson by no later than 4 p.m., Friday, November 6, 2009; and Pancho's is directed to produce for plaintiff a privilege log no later than 4 p.m., Friday, November 13, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S & S Sales Inc v. Pancho's Mexican Foods Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S & S Sales Inc
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pancho's Mexican Foods Inc
Represented By: Shea Sisk Wellford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?