Sandlin v. Humphrey et al

Plaintiff: Christopher R Sandlin
Defendant: Micheal T Humphrey, Seccer Cole, Henry Williams, Moses Jackson, III, Dennis I Jackson, James Crumpton, M Williams, J C Andrews, Aundrea F Weekly, Steven Outlaw, Greg Harmon, Ray A Hobbs, Larry May, Larry Norris, James Gibson, Audrey B Garrett, Trawanda L Wright, Ronnie Hoskins, Edward Eaten, Benjamin Woodard, Faron Clemmons, Dennis McCoy, Terry L Warren, Jr, M Rogers and Ball
Case Number: 2:2009cv00051
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2012 248 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Based upon the 242 Jury's Verdict as to Defendants Michael Humphrey and Seccer Cole, Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice with plaintiff taking nothing. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/13/2012. (dmn)
April 12, 2012 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 246 Motion for Costs and ordering the Clerk of the Court to disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $937.62 and distribute it to the named applicant. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/12/11. (kpr)
April 28, 2011 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 219 Motion in Limine; granting defts' 222 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/28/11. (vjt)
April 22, 2011 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the defts are not required to have Danny Burl present at trial 215 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/22/11. (kpr)
April 6, 2011 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 197 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/6/11. (kpr)
April 4, 2011 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 207 Amended Witness List filed by Christopher R Sandlin directing Defts to file no later than April 11, 2011, a response to Plaintiff's witness list, along with a statement as to which, if any, of pltf's witnesses defts will have present without the need of writs of habeas corpus ad testificandum or subpoenas, including a list of witnesses to be called and a list of exhibits to be used at the hearing. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/4/11. (kpr)
March 31, 2011 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 192 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 193 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 194 Motion to Produce; granting 201 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 197 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Replies due by 4/8/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/31/11. (kpr)
January 20, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 179 Motion to Appoint Counsel 180 , to continue, to 181 Compel and 182 in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/20/11. (bkp)
February 4, 2010 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 151 Partial Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/4/10. (bkp)
December 11, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 105 Partial Report and Recommendations denying motions for injunctive relief and for preliminary injunctive relief, 81 85 88 80 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/11/09. (bkp)
November 30, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 103 Motion to Compel; denying 112 Motion for Order; denying 115 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/30/09. (bkp)
November 19, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)
November 6, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the defts to file responses within ten days of the date of this Order to 81 MOTION for Relief filed by Christopher R Sandlin, 85 MOTION for Order filed by Christopher R Sandlin, 86 MOTION to Compel filed by Christopher R Sandlin, 88 MOTION for Relief filed by Christopher R Sandlin, 80 MOTION for Relief filed by Christopher R Sandlin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/6/09. (bkp)
October 2, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting deadline for filing dispositive motions within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/2/09. (mkf)
September 24, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 62 and denying 57 59 Motions for Injunctive Relief filed by Christopher R Sandlin. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/24/09. (bkp)
July 23, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 12 MOTION for Order 43 MOTION for Discovery 16 MOTION to Compel are actually all requests for discovery for defts and should be docketed as such and removed from the pending motions list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/23/09. (bkp)
July 8, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 12 MOTION for Order to suppress evidence filed by Christopher R Sandlin directing the plaintiff to clarify, within 10 days of the date of this Order, his intentions in his motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/8/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandlin v. Humphrey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R Sandlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal T Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seccer Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis I Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Crumpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aundrea F Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray A Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey B Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trawanda L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Eaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faron Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L Warren, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?