Krepps v. Ballwin et al

Plaintiff: Jimmy Dean Krepps
Defendant: Ronnie Ballwin, John Carter and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2009cv00074
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered re 36 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice and certifying that an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/20/10. (bkp)
June 7, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 29 Motion to Compel; pltf shall file, within 14 days of the entry of this Order, his answers to the discovery requests as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/7/10. (vjt)
January 26, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defendant Jason Doe without prejudice due to a lack of service. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/26/10. (bkp)
August 26, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations dismissing deft Ronnie Ballwin without prejudice; certifying that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith; directing plaintiff to file, within 120 days from the entry of th is Order, a motion for service containing the full name and a valid service address for deft Jason Doe; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for deft John Carter and the U.S. Marshal to serve deft with a copy of the summons, complaint, amended complaint, second amended complaint and this order without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/26/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krepps v. Ballwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Dean Krepps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Ballwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?