Hall et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc

Plaintiff: Samuel P Hall and Brenda Hall
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv00091
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding plaintiffs prejudgment interest in the amount of $ 46,792.73, attorneys' fees in the amount of $40,735.83, and costs in the amount of $486.08. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/2/11. (kpr)
November 19, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying 65 Judgment until the appeal becomes final, or, if no appeal is filed, until the expiration of the time to appeal. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/19/10. (bkp)
November 15, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 64 Order granting Motion to Dismiss in favor of Brenda Hall, Samuel P Hall against David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc in the amount of $181,194, payable to Samuel P. Hall and Brenda C. Hall, husband and wife, plus post-judgment interest of.21% per annum until paid. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/15/10. (bkp)
August 19, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 27 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/19/10. (bkp)
April 13, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 46 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc. The Clerk is directed to substitute exhibit 1 to the motion with a recently submitted substitute exhibit containing redacted Social Security numbers. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/13/10. (bkp)
March 25, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/25/10. (bkp)
October 16, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 NOTICE of Related Case and transferring this case to Judge Brian S. Miller pursuant to General Order No. 39. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/16/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel P Hall
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Hall
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?