Pam v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Vincent Pam
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2009cv00093
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Vincent Pam. The Court has reviewed the Objections and finds them to be without merit. The Order and Judgment of October 13, 2009, remain the Court's decision. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/15/09. (bkp)
October 13, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 13 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing petition with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/13/09. (bkp)
September 22, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 10 Respondent's MOTION to Dismiss be GRANTED and that 2 Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DISMISSED with prejudice and the relief requested DENIED. Objections to Report and Recommendations due by 10/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/22/2009. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pam v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Pam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?