Smith et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc

Plaintiff: Joe K Smith, Jan G Smith, Irene N Smith and Juanita B Andrews
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv00101
Filed: July 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 63 68 Motion for Attorney Fees. Awarding Joe and Jan Smith prejudgment interest in the amount of $11,761.74; awarding Irene Smith $12,117.59; awarding attorneys' fees in the amount of $31,575.51 and awarding costs in the amount of $480.10. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on March 2, 2011.(kpr)
November 9, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 69 Motion and supplemental Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/9/10. (bkp)
October 18, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Jan G Smith, Joe K Smith in the amount of $48,840 against David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc; in favor of Irene N Smith in the amount of $49,374 against David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc re 57 Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/18/10. (bkp)
September 3, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/3/10. (bkp)
March 25, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/25/10. (bkp)
October 16, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 NOTICE of Related Case and transferring case to Judge Brian S. Miller pursuant to General Order No. 39. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/16/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe K Smith
Represented By: Charles David Roscopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan G Smith
Represented By: Charles David Roscopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene N Smith
Represented By: Charles David Roscopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita B Andrews
Represented By: Charles David Roscopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?