Glaze v. May et al

Plaintiff: Cedric Glaze
Defendant: Bobby May, Johnny Jones, Otis Smith, Justin Futrell, Scott, Daniel Getchell, Ronnie Heard, Fred Houston, John Does and St. Francis County
Case Number: 2:2009cv00113
Filed: August 17, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending 84 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations to state that the motion for summary judgment with regard to defendant May, instead of defendant Jay, is granted and the action against him is dismissed with prejudice. The rest of the order stands as written. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/3/10. (bkp)
January 20, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 54 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting the motion to 29 Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Ronnie Heard, Fred Houston. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/20/10. (bkp)
November 4, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Ronnie Heard, Fred Houston directing the parties to file additional information concerning how plaintiff was harmed by the confiscation of his legal materials, within fifteen days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)
October 14, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft Justin Futrell and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons, original and amended complaints at the address provided in this Order without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/14/09. (bkp)
October 13, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts St. Francis County and Major Barnes for plaintiff's failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/13/09. (bkp)
October 6, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Stay Discovery; denying 34 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 19 Motion to Set Aside summons and service and directing defts to provide to the Court the last-known address of deft Futrell within ten days of the d ate of this Order: Plaintiff is directed to file an updated request to proceed ifp within 10 days of the date of this Order and directing the Clerk of the Court to forward to plaintiff an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/6/09. (bkp)
September 4, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts with summons, original and amended complaints without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/4/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaze v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Futrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Getchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Francis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?