Brown v. Avant et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Everett Brown
Defendant: Marco Avant, Wanda Brooks, Essie Clay, Greg Harmon, J Hughes, Cook, Beech, Anthony Thomas and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 2:2009cv00133
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 154 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 131 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/5/12. (vjt)
October 11, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 143 request to reset the deadline for filing a response; pltf's response to defts' 131 motion for summary judgment is due no later than 21 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/11/11. (vjt)
October 6, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 119 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, separate defts' 96 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; pltf's claims against CMS are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf's claims against defts B each, Cook, Hughes, and Thomas are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; pltf's 104 MOTION to Strike is DENIED; Correctional Medical Services Inc, Joseph Hughes, Anthony Thomas, Belinda Beach and Steven Cook terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/6/10. (vjt)
June 10, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 94 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/10/10. (vjt)
May 11, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 84 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; the motion is GRANTED to the extent that all of pltf's claims re du e process and claims re disciplinary convictions are dismissed; all of pltf's claims against defts Wendy Kelley and Essie Clay are dismissed; defts' motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/11/10. (vjt)
April 23, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 78 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft CMS's 52 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/23/10. (vjt)
March 31, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pltf an additional 14 days to respond to defts' 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; the ADC Defts' 57 Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED in all respects, except that they are directed to allow Pltf an opportunity to review his medical file, and provide him with copies of his grievances, and his isolation medical screening; denying Pltf's Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/31/10. (vjt)
October 26, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendant Thomas, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint (docket entry#2), this order, and summons, on Thomas, in the care of CMS, w/o prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/26/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Avant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Everett Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Avant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essie Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?