Southern Bancorp Bank NA v. Bayer CropScience LP et al

Plaintiff: Southern Bancorp Bank NA
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP and Bayer CropScience Holding Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv00136
Filed: September 11, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 59 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Bayer CropScience Holding Inc, Bayer CropScience LP, dismissing the complaint of Southern Bancorp Bank NA with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/11. (vjt)
July 26, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion for Reconsideration re 39 Memorandum & Opinion. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/26/10. (bkp)
June 14, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Bayer's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; Pltf's 24 Motion to Amend the Final Scheduling Order is GRANTED; the Bench Trial scheduled for 7/12/10 is continued, and a new scheduling order will be issued by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/14/10. (vjt)
November 17, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Defts' 3 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/17/09. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Bancorp Bank NA v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Bancorp Bank NA
Represented By: John Polk Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Holding Inc
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?