King v. USA

Plaintiff: Alan King
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2009cv00163
Filed: October 28, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2011 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 122 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/13/11. (vjt)
January 6, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 104 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case without prejudice with respect to pltf's claims brought pursuant to Bivens v. Six Unknown Agents of Fed. Bureau of Narcotics; and with prejudice to his claims brought pursuant to the Federal Tort Claims Act, denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/6/11. (bkp)
December 15, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the motions to dismiss and for summary judgment be granted and pltf's claims be dismissed 74 86 90 97 . Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 12/15/2010. (lej)
August 9, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 79 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 78 Motion for Default Judgment; and granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by USA for 45 days from the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/9/10. (bkp)
July 7, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 68 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 17 Motion to Dismiss filed by USA. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/7/10. (bkp)
April 8, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Notice of Appeal filed by Alan R King, Jr. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/8/10. (bkp)
March 25, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel for Deft USA to file under seal, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order, the last known address of Steven Melton. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/25/10. (vjt)
March 4, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 20 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Alan R King, Jr. and directing the Clerk to add the name of Steve Melton as a deft. and to prepare summons and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint, amended complaint, this order and summons upon deft Melton, the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney without prepayment of fees therefor; and referring 17 Motion to Dismiss back to Magistrate Judge H. David Young for appropriate action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/4/10. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 3/5/2010 to correct typographical error.) (thd).
October 23, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Adopting 6 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff. (DWor) [Transferred from mied on 10/28/2009.]
August 27, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by Alan King Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald A Scheer. (MLan) [Transferred from mied on 10/28/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?