Cantrell v. Beebe et al

Plaintiff: Jimmy Shane Cantrell
Defendant: Mike Beebe, Dustin McDaniel, Little Rock, City of, Larry Norris, Pulaski County Sheriff Department, Little Rock Police Department, Ray Hobbs, Greg Harmon, Westbrook, Arkansas Department of Correction, Correctional Medical Services, Wendy Kelley, Dottie Yarborough, Roland Anderson, Green, Moses Jackson, Maurice Williams, T Sanders, Humphry, Hughes, James E Brown, April, M D Reed, Gallon, Robinson, H David Young, Cody, James Gibson, Estes, Kristen J Trigg, Darnell Williams, Does and H Foreman
Case Number: 2:2009cv00184
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2011 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 208 Motion for Ruling; granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and granting plaintiff an additional fifteen days in which to file his objections to the Partial Report and Recommendation; denying 210 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 210 Motion for Copies; and denying 210 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/26/11. (kpr)
July 1, 2011 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 198 Motion for Hearing; granting 198 Motion for Copies and directing the Clerk to order a copy of the transcript of the May 23, 2011 Hearing and to forward a copy of such to plaintiff; denying 198 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 198 Motion to Compel; granting 200 Motion for Ruling; granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/1/11. (kpr)
June 2, 2011 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 168 190 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/2/11. (kpr)
April 19, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response, within 10 days of the date of this Order, to the 168 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Hughes, Roland Anderson, Dottie Yarbrough, Correctional Medical Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/19/11. (kpr)
March 7, 2011 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot defts' 158 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/7/11. (vjt)
February 14, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 150 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/14/11. (bkp)
February 8, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 127 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying plaintiff's 4 Motion for a temporary restraining order, which the Court construes as a motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/8/11. (bkp)
October 21, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining: Defs are directed to respond to this motion within ten days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/21/10. (bkp)
October 7, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Reconsideration; directing the clerk of court to re-open the 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; referring 4 Motion to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney for disposition; denying plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel without prejudice; and, denying the request for class certification. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/7/2010. (dmn)
September 15, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 83 denying 78 Motion for TRO,and granting Motion for Copies filed by Jimmy Shane Cantrell and directing the Clerk to forward to plaintiff copies of docket entries 58, 64, 66, 68, 70, 72-74, as well as all certificates of mailing. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/15/10. (bkp)
September 8, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 Motion to Sever without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/8/10. (bkp)
July 8, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion for TRO; denying 106 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 106 Motion for Copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/8/10. (bkp)
June 18, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 86 91 Motion to Amend/Correct, for reconsideration and to compel; granting pltf's motion to extend time in which to file objections to the Partial Report and Recommendation. Replies due by 7/19/10; granting in part plain tiff's motion for temporary restraining order, which this Court construes as a motion for copies and other objections (96), and directing the Clerk to forward to plaintiff copies of docket entries 82, 84, 86-88, and denying the motion in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/18/10. (bkp)
June 4, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 65 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 60 Motion for TRO filed by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/4/10. (bkp)
June 2, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing the defts set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/2/10. (bkp)
May 10, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/10/10. (bkp)
April 23, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Recusal as moot as this case was transferred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on April 19, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/23/10. (bkp)
March 16, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion for Service; denying 44 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 48 Motion for Ruling; granting 48 Motion for Copies and directing the Clerk to send to plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet, together with copies of docket entries ## 7, 9, 15-27, 30, 32, 38, 39 and 41. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/16/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion for Service 4 as moot 4 ; and denying 4 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Beebe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Shane Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dottie Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humphry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M D Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H David Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen J Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?