Hastings v. Norris et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Hastings
Defendant: Larry Norris, Wendy Kelly, D Yarbrough, Holloway and B Simmons
Case Number: 2:2009cv00186
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Presiding Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JUDGMENT re 55 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/30/10. (bkp)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying pltf's 49 Motion for Reconsideration; pltf is directed to file a response to the May 20, 2010 Order 43 , and to the ADC defts' Motion for Summary Judgment 46 , within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/14/10. (vjt)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re 14 MOTION to Dismiss, which the Court construes as a motion for summary judgment, directing the parties to file additional evidence in support of their respective positions, within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/20/10. (bkp)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER directing plaintiff to provide corrected information concerning defts Mann and Roziakie's identities within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/16/10. (bkp)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint and amended complaint on defts Norris and Kelly in care of the Compliance Division, ADC, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550; and on defts Yarbrough, Holloway, Powell, Mann, Norman, Edwards, Grisby, Granger, Roziakie and Lowe in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, all without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/19/10. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?