Miller v. James et al

Plaintiff: William A Miller
Defendant: Phillip James, Kurt James and Walter Sullivan
Case Number: 2:2010cv00026
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving settlement, payment of fees and expenses and distribution of proceeds 111 . The Administrator shall pay the contractual attorneys's fees and expenses due to the Hare Wynn Firm as set forth in the Petition. The remaining settlement proceeds shall be distributed to the adult heirs-at-law of Matthew Tolbert Miller, deceased. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/1/12. (kpr)
January 27, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/26/12. (kpr)
January 3, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to 96 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Sam Scales Marine of Stuttgart LLC no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, January 11, 2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/3/12. (kpr)
January 21, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to Dismiss Parties Philip James, individually and d/b/a Greenheads and Labs; Kurt James and Walter Sullivan, individually and d/b/a Greenheads and Labs, II with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/21/11. (bkp)
January 20, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion to Dismiss Party and dismissing with prejudice parties Philip James, individually and d/b/a Greenheads and Labs; Kurt James and Walter Sullivan, individually and d/b/a Greenheads and Labs, II,. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/20/11. (bkp)
August 18, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases and consolidating this case as lead with 3:10cv00092-DPM, as member; and directing that all future pleadings be filed under the lead case. The Scheduling Order in the lead case now applies to both cases. These cases are set for jury trial the week of Tuesday, March 22, 2010, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 314, 612 Walnut, Helena, AR 72342. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/18/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Miller
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?