Sandlin v. Clemmons et al

Plaintiff: Christopher R Sandlin
Defendant: Faron R Clemmons, Artis Ray Hobbs, Moses Jackson, III and Margaret B Rogers
Case Number: 2:2010cv00031
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2011 122 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 121 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/15/11. (vjt)
January 27, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 105 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 102 Motion for Injunctive Relief, which the Court construes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/27/11. (vjt)
November 23, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 88 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, defts Hobbs and Rogers are DISMISSED from pltf's complaint without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; Artis Ray Hobbs and Margaret B Rogers terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/23/10. (vjt)
August 17, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 37 Motion for Injunctive Relief is hereby DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/17/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandlin v. Clemmons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R Sandlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faron R Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artis Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret B Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?