Cohen v. Augusta Arkansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Sherman T Cohen
Defendant: Augusta Arkansas, City of, Augusta Arkansas City Council, Jimmy Rhodes and Charles Allen
Case Number: 2:2010cv00034
Filed: March 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT re 66 Order dismissing with prejudice the amended complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/12. (kpr)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER dismissing Cohen's claims against the City Council of the City of Augusta without prejudice; reopening discovery solely on the questions surrounding the "new letter"; and, in addition to the ddls set out in the Court's 56 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, the parties must exchange their final exhibit lists and copies of the exhibits by January 11, 2011. The Court requests chambers' copies of all the exhibits on that date as well. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/11. (kpr)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. A hearing to consider argument from counsel on the questions outlined in this Order is set for December 16, 2011, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom B155 in the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthous e. The case is set for trial on January 16, 2012; pretrial disclosure sheets are due December 30, 2011; motions in limine are due December 30, 2011, with responses due January 6, 2012; and draft jury instructions are due January 11, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/11. (kpr)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Strike. The Court will allow plaintiff to respond. Cohen's sur-reply is due October 31, 2011. No further briefing will be allowed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/20/11. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Augusta Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman T Cohen
Represented By: Winston Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta Arkansas City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?