Williams v. Stewart et al

Plaintiff: David Williams
Defendant: Kathy Stewart, Moses Jackson, Essie Clay, Cody and Greg Harmon
Case Number: 2:2010cv00042
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
0 Judge: Henry L. Jones
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 144 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/1/11. (vjt)
November 17, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 140 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to 138 Report and Recommendations; Objections to R&R due 11/28/11. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/17/11. (vjt)
August 16, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 120 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 116 Motion for Permanent Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/16/11. (vjt)
March 31, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 91 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/31/11. (kpr)
December 27, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/27/10. (bkp)
December 1, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion to Enforce; granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/1/10. (bkp)
November 15, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a response to plaintiff's 63 MOTION to Enforce within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/15/10. (bkp)
October 20, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/20/10. (bkp)
September 24, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 51 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 37 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, which the Court construes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; the motion is granted to the extent that pltf should be allowed to keep and have access to the pleadings and exhibits in this case, and is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/24/10. (vjt)
September 23, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration of 43 Order denying motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/23/10. (bkp)
August 12, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, defts' 19 MOTION to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED IN PART with respect to all claims against defts Jackson, Clay, Cody, and Harmon, and DENIED with respect to the retaliatory disciplinary claim against deft Stewart; Greg Harmon, Moses Jackson, Essie Clay and Cody terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/12/10. (vjt)
June 23, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to again change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of this defendant as Kathy Stewart 25 and directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for deft Kathy Stewart and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on deft at the address provided under seal without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/23/10. (bkp)
June 22, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change deft Kathy Stewart's name to Kathy Steward, and further directing the Clerk to re-issue summons on deft Steward at the address provided by defendants and to maintain this address under seal for security purposes; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons and complaint upon deft without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/22/10. (bkp)
June 8, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Case: Plaintiff shall file a response within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Defts are ordered to provide the last-known adddress of deft Kathy Stewart within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/8/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essie Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?