Turner v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Carl Stanley Turner
Defendant: Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, Greg Harmon, Paula Green, R T Ball, Andrew, Moore, Moses Jackson, Ray Clemmons, Hills, Thomas, Sharon King, Joe Hughes, Brooks and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2010cv00050
Filed: April 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Partial Report and Recommendation 80 denying 49 defts' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/3/10. (bkp)
November 30, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Partial Report and Recommendation 74 ; and denying 15 Motion for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/30/10. (bkp)
November 17, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding the 78 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Carl Stanley Turner to be without merit and referring the discovery requests back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/17/10. (bkp)
November 12, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 74 Partial Report and Recommendations 15 and dismissing plaintiff's claims against defts Thomas and Moore without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/12/10. (bkp)
October 6, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing pltf's 71 Objections to Report and Recommendations as a motion for extension of time; pltf is granted 30 days from the date of this Order to provide the Court with the requested information regarding his allegations against Thomas and Moore. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/6/10. (vjt)
August 24, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/24/10. (bkp)
August 13, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Partial Report and Recommendations and allowing plaintiff to proceed against defts Norris, Hobbs, Harmon, Green, Ball, Andrew, Moore, Thomas, King, and Hughes, and dismissing all of plaintiff's other claims without prejudice and removing the names of all other individuals as party defts. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/13/10. (bkp)
July 27, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that service is approriate on defts Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, Greg Harmon, Paula Green, R.T. Ball, Andrew, Moore, Thomas, Sharon King and Joe Hughes and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint, amended complaint, this order, and summons upon them, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/27/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Stanley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R T Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?