Pruitt v. Outlaw
Plaintiff: Anthony Renard Pruitt
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2010cv00052
Filed: April 16, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT pursuant to 18 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered denying the petition for writ of habeas corpus and dismissing this action in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/3/10. (vjt)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Renard Pruitt be denied, dismissing this action in its entirety with prejudice; Objections to R&R due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/12/10. (vjt)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER if Petitioner desires to file a reply to 9 Response to Habeas Petition filed by T C Outlaw, he is directed to do so on or before 7/2/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/3/10. (vjt)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 3 Brief in Support of Petition, and this Order on Respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail; Respondent is directed to file a response to the petition within 21 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 5/10/10. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruitt v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Renard Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?