Jordan v. Nassar et al

Plaintiff: Mae Ella Jordan
Defendant: Ray Nassar and Hughes School District
Case Number: 2:2010cv00065
Filed: May 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Hughes School District against Mae Ella Jordan re 39 Order; and, dismissing Mae Ella Jordan's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/28/2011. (dmn)
April 22, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Mae Ella Jordan to bring a cell phone into the U.S. Courthouse in Helena between Monday, April 25, 2011, and Tuesday, April 26, 2011, subject to the rules set forth herein. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/22/11. (kpr)
July 13, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's request for counsel contained in her 10 Response to the Order denying her motion for appointment of counsel is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/13/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Nassar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Ella Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Nassar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?