Champion v. Clark et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Champion
Defendant: Richer Clark, Manning Jones, Hughes, Sharon Jones and Charlotte Green
Case Number: 2:2010cv00070
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall Jr.
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 134 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/20/11. (vjt)
November 4, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Amanda Norman and Walter Holloway at their last known addresses and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint, amended complaint and this Order on these defts without prepayment of costs therefor. Addresses are to remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/4/10. (bkp)
October 20, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Flora Jones (originally sued as Flover Jones); the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 2 81 , and this Order on deft Flora Jones (ADDRESS FILED UNDER SEAL), without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/20/10. (vjt)
July 9, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect deft. Richard Clark's correct name; to re-issue summons on Manning Jones and Sharon Jones in care of counsel for the prison medical contractor; and to issue summons upon deft Richard Clark at the sealed address; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve these defts without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/9/10. (bkp)
July 7, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to pltf's representation in his 15 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, the Clerk is directed to update the docket sheet to reflect his timely jury demand. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/7/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richer Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manning Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?