Lopez v. Sanders et al

Plaintiff: Nick Lopez
Defendant: Linda Sanders, T C Outlaw and John Does
Case Number: 2:2010cv00076
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall Jr.
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 114 Order granting Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing nonsuited claims against defendants, as set forth in this Judgment, without prejudice. All other claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/5/13. (kpr)
August 31, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/31/12. (kpr)
July 8, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying motions based on lack of personal jurisdiction over former Warden Sanders, without prejudice; granting Lopez until September 1, 2011, to investigate further the transfer to California; granting the warden defts' motion to dismiss t he Fifth and Fourteenth Amendment claims; denying the warden defts' motion for summary judgment on the Eighth Amendment claim, without prejudice. The Court permits discovery regarding the Eighth Amendment claim until October 1, 2011; dismissing the remaining defts' motion to dismiss the Fifth and Fourteenth Amendment claims, and the claims dismissed without prejudice, for the reasons indicated herein; and granting plaintiff until October 1, 2011 to do basic discovery and either propose an amended complaint specifying the involvement of each deft or move to voluntarily dismiss them. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/8/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Lopez
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?