Myers v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Anthony Levon Myers
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2010cv00080
Filed: June 9, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 19 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered denying the petition for writ of habeas corpus and dismissing this action in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/23/11. (vjt)
August 17, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER if Petitioner desires to file a reply to 10 Response to Habeas Petition filed by T C Outlaw, he is directed to do so on or before 9/17/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 8/17/10. (vjt)
June 29, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Levon Myers and this Order on Respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail; Respondent is directed to file a response to the petition within 21 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/29/10. (vjt)
June 10, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Petitioner to submit either the $5.00 filing fee or the ifp application (enclosed) within 30 days of this Order's entry date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/10/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Levon Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?