Barnes v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Guy Clayton Barnes
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Burls, Belkens, J W Bell and Pettie
Case Number: 2:2010cv00101
Filed: July 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ADOPTING 91 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 78 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and pltf's complaint against defts is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/29/11. (vjt)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re 17 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Belkens, J W Bell, Pettie, Burls. The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of defts Theaster Petty, John Belken, James Bell, and Danny Burl. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/4/11. (kpr) (Docket text modified on 11/4/2011 to correct a typographical error.) (thd).
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 74 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/22/11. (kpr)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/1/11. (kpr)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying as moot 22 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/11/11. (bkp)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Adopting 10 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, deft ADC is hereby DISMISSED from pltf's complaint; Arkansas Department of Correction terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/19/10. (vjt)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts Burls, Belkens, J.W. Bell and Pettie with a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons in care of the Arkansas Board of Correction and Community Punishment Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without payment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/20/10. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Clayton Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J W Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pettie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?