Namer v. USA et al

Plaintiff: David I Namer
Defendant: USA, Department of Justice, United States Bureau of Prisons, Federal Correctional Institute Forrest City and T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2010cv00112
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 69 Memorandum and Order dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/28/12. (kpr)
November 9, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 50 Motion to Withdraw his 49 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/9/11. (vjt)
October 13, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part pltf's 46 Motion to Continue Discovery; Discovery due by 12/1/2011; Motions due by 1/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/13/11. (vjt)
August 23, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Compel without prejudice ; and denying 40 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/23/11. (kpr)
July 26, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion for Relief; denying 31 Motion in Limine; holding in abeyance 33 Motion to Compel, pending deft's response to plaintiff's reply; and denying 36 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/26/11. (kpr)
November 30, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/30/10. (bkp)
September 15, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and directing that defts United States Dept of Justice, United States Bureau of Prisons, FCI Forrest City, Arkansas, and Warden T.C. Outlaw be dismissed from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/15/10. (bkp) Modified on 9/16/2010 to correct typographical error (bkp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Namer v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David I Namer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Correctional Institute Forrest City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?