Obama v. Burl et al

Plaintiff: Ishmael Hassan Obama
Defendant: Danny Burl, Ray Hobbs, Moses Jackson, III and Todd Ball
Case Number: 2:2010cv00126
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 66 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 57 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/8/13. (vjt)
February 7, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 55 and denying 50 Motion to Dismiss. Defts must file any dispositive motions within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/7/13. (kpr)
January 16, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/16/2013. (kcs)
October 15, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim; the dismissal of this action constitutes as "strike" pursuant to 28 USC 1915(g); judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/15/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obama v. Burl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishmael Hassan Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?