Pachinger v. United States Bureau of Prisons et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth John Pachinger
Defendant: United States Bureau of Prisons, Doe and Tolliver
Case Number: 2:2010cv00161
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the Order of Dismissal that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants on all claims set forth herein. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order of Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/5/12. (hph)
August 18, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying docket entry # 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/18/2011. (kcs)
June 21, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying docket entry # 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/21/2011. (ksm)
May 16, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying docket entry # 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery and directing the Clerk to REFRAIN FROM DOCKETING any future written discovery from Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/16/2011. (ksm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pachinger v. United States Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth John Pachinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?