Salazar v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Luciano Ramirez Salazar
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2010cv00193
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's 30 Order entered in this case, IT IS CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that the Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/18/2012. (dmn)
March 15, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing petitioner of his opportunity to reply within 30 days to 14 Response to Habeas Petition filed by T C Outlaw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/15/11. (kpr)
December 27, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail and directing respondent to file his response within 20 days after service of this petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/27/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luciano Ramirez Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?