Jones et al v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Tyrone Jones and Ahmeen Mumit
Defendant: Paulette Green, Greg Harmon, Moses Jackson, Ray Hobbs, Larry May, Danny Burl, Todd Ball and Valerie Westbrook
Case Number: 2:2010cv00202
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 122 Order Dismissing Case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/6/12. (kpr)
April 9, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court finds a hearing on the pending motion for summary judgment will be helpful to its determination, and will be set by separate Order. The Court specifically wishes to hear evidence, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/9/12. (kpr)
February 16, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff Ahmeen Mumit; and finding as moot 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/16/12. (kpr)
February 13, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the Evidentiary Hearing set for February 29, 2012. The Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 7203 West 7th Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/13/12. (kpr)
January 17, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice, subject to renewal, defts' 82 Motion to Sever. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/17/12. (vjt)
January 12, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 84 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 79 Motion for Order filed by Tyrone Jones. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/12/12. (kpr)
September 22, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 69 Motion to Extend Time in which to file dispositive motions until November 7, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/22/11. (kpr)
September 12, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 61 Motion for Reconsideration of 56 Order on Motion to Compel. Defendants are directed to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment, which this Court construes as a motion for sanctions, within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/12/11. (kpr)
July 7, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/7/11. (kpr)
June 7, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltfs' 47 Motion for Reconsideration of 42 Order denying Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/7/11. (vjt)
January 3, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff Ahmeen Mumit to either submit the statutory filing fee of $350 or a proper and complete application to proceed ifp with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official within 30 days from the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to plaintiff Mumit an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/3/11. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulette Green
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Westbrook
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmeen Mumit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?